|
Post by Dave Homewood on Aug 10, 2024 11:41:55 GMT 12
Roderick Percy "Roddy/Teapot" McKAY 4.6.1934 - 3.8.2024 90 years young. Aircraftman First Class in RNZAF -10yrs service. Passed peacefully in his sleep on Saturday, August 3, 2024 at Holmwood Rest Home, Rangiora. Son of the late Helen MacIntosh and Roderick McKay, brother of Merl McKinlay, Irene Goodwin (deceased), and Rachel Mattson (deceased). Sadly missed Uncle of Trevor Goodwin and Wana Goodwin, Yvonne Chapple, Peter McKinlay, Toni Early and Karl Mattson. Great-Uncle of Jed, Taylor, Jacob, Jonty, Ollie, Madeleine, Ellison, Corey, Ashleigh and Oska. A special friend and companion of Jean. Special thanks to Holmwood staff for their care of Rod. Rod is to be interred at Linwood Cemetery at a later date. If you would like to attend this service please leave your details at John Rhind Funeral Directors, Kaiapoi. Messages to the McKay family, C/- PO Box 102, Hanmer Springs 7334.
|
|
|
Post by trees on Aug 12, 2024 10:41:51 GMT 12
MHCM (RTD) Trevor Michael Richard "Snozz" Healey G342706 HCM RNZAF 26 February 1955 until 25 February 1977. Posted to 41 SQN August 1973 until August 1975 and went to Vietnam. Died 9th August 2024, peacefully at home with family, aged 87years. Loved Husband of Maureen (Martin). Beloved Dad of Sean and Lorraine, Richard, Kelly and Laura, and Denise. Special Grandad of Gemma and Ryan, Rachael, Hannah and Todd, Jordan, Eden and Vic, Joe, Eva, Frankie, and GG to Matthew and Luke. A private cremation has already been held by the family. Very special thanks to Dr. Steve French and Hospice Waikato for their care of Trevor. Published by Waikato Times on Aug. 12, 2024.
|
|
|
Post by trees on Aug 12, 2024 11:00:53 GMT 12
WING COMMANDER (RTD) PETER MALCOLM KING, X1017748, LOGISTICS OFFICER, RNZAF
It is with great sadness I advise the passing of Wing Commander (Rtd) Peter King in Mosgiel on 3 August 2024.
Wing Commander King served as Regular Force with the Royal New Zealand Air Force from 24 February 2005 to 30 June 2016 and as a Reservist from May 2016 to June 2019. On enlistment, Wing Commander King was posted as Officer Commanding Support Training Squadron, before postings as Officer Commanding Air Movements Flight, Expeditionary Support Squadron and to logistics and movements roles at HQJFNZ. Promoted to Wing Commander in October 2011, Wing Commander King was posted to RNZAF Woodbourne between 2011 and 2015 as Commanding Officer Ground Training Wing, before returning to Wellington with postings to the Joint Support Component Command and the Joint Movements project. Wing Commander King was awarded the New Zealand Defence Service Medal with effect from February 2008, and the New Zealand Armed Forces Award with effect from February 2013.
Prior to enlisting in the Royal New Zealand Air Force, Wing Commander Pete King served in the Royal Air Force between August 1976 and February 2002.
A private, family-only, memorial service was held last week. Our thoughts are with June and the entire King family.
|
|
|
Post by Dave Homewood on Aug 13, 2024 17:03:10 GMT 12
SALTER, Robert John (John). RAF 1929806 (1956 - 1959) Passed away on 9 August 2024, aged 85. Loved husband of Beth and loved father and father in law of Claire and Dean Maisey and Nicola and Rob Nicholl. Loved Grandad (Rara) to Alex and Luciana and Zara. A service will be held at Elliott's Chapel on Cameron, Tauranga, Friday 16th August at 1pm.
|
|
|
Post by trees on Aug 13, 2024 17:53:06 GMT 12
SGT (RTD) Robert Allen "Bob" Anderson L79820 EFIT RNZAF 10 July 1959 until 8 April 1974 and 41 SQN Singapore August 1969 until 1971. Bob passed away 12 August 24 at 2350 surrounded by his wife Anne and three daughters Adele, Marie and Sonja, at home in Matamata. Bob enlisted with No 14 Boy Entrant Scheme and he spent time on 42 SQN. He resigned from the RNZAF while posted to Wigram in 1972. A private cremation will be held in Matamata this week.
|
|
|
Post by trees on Aug 15, 2024 15:59:22 GMT 12
GSH Herbert “Bert” Anscombe S14046 RNZN 17 January 1952 to 1 September 1965, NZ Police, NZ Army and RNZAF 1 July 1985 until 2 March 2003. Also served 11 May 1967 until 26 January 1970 and 1 July 1985 until 2 March 2003. He served in RNZN and Served in Operation Grapple on HMNZ Pukaki from 13 March 1957 to 6 June 1958, NZ Police then NZ Army (L/CPL Vietnam with 1 Australian Logistics Support Group 1ALSG) and ending his employment as a GSH at RNZAF Base Woodbourne from 1 July 1985 until 2 March 2003.
Born 2 September 1935 Bert passed away 10 August 2024 in Westport but is going to be buried at Fairhall cemetery Blenheim next Thursday 22nd August at 1300 hours. Apparently, there won't be any family as he only has elderly 87-year-old brother who lives in Timaru who may not be able to get to the funeral. Therefore we invite all Ex and Serving Defence Force personnel to attend the burial in the RSA Section of Fairhall cemetery. The Marlborough RSA will be conducting the RSA service and will recite the ode and a bugler play the last post. Lets see if we can get a few members to go to the service at the cemetery and give Bert a good send off.
|
|
|
Post by errolmartyn on Aug 15, 2024 20:11:39 GMT 12
GSH Herbert “Bert” Anscombe S14046 RNZN 17 January 1952 to 1 September 1965, NZ Police, NZ Army and RNZAF 1 July 1985 until 2 March 2003. Also served 11 May 1967 until 26 January 1970 and 1 July 1985 until 2 March 2003. He served in RNZN and Served in Operation Grapple on HMNZ Pukaki from 13 March 1957 to 6 June 1958, NZ Police then NZ Army (L/CPL Vietnam with 1 Australian Logistics Support Group 1ALSG) and ending his employment as a GSH at RNZAF Base Woodbourne from 1 July 1985 until 2 March 2003. Born 2 September 1935 Bert passed away 10 August 2024 in Westport but is going to be buried at Fairhall cemetery Blenheim next Thursday 22nd August at 1300 hours. Apparently, there won't be any family as he only has elderly 87-year-old brother who lives in Timaru who may not be able to get to the funeral. Therefore we invite all Ex and Serving Defence Force personnel to attend the burial in the RSA Section of Fairhall cemetery. The Marlborough RSA will be conducting the RSA service and will recite the ode and a bugler play the last post. Lets see if we can get a few members to go to the service at the cemetery and give Bert a good send off. From Colin Hanson’s By Such Deeds – Honours and awards in the Royal New Zealand Air Force, 1923 – 1999: Chief of Air Staff Commendation (abbreviated citation) ANSCOMBE, General Service Hand Herbert, S14046, Air Assistant. (1995) - in recognition of the high performance of his duties as Flight Storeman, 4 TTS and his meritorious involvement in the local community.
Errol
|
|
|
Post by trees on Aug 20, 2024 17:07:58 GMT 12
W/O (RTD) John Dover "Harry" Hare Q79548 AVTECH RNZAF 2 July 1958 until 1 December 1996 on Sunday 18 August 2024 at Blenheim hospice. A celebration of Harry’s life will be held at Springlands chapel Cloudy Bay funeral services at 1pm Saturday 24th August. Feel free to leave messages for Jan and the family below.
|
|
|
Post by errolmartyn on Aug 20, 2024 17:57:05 GMT 12
W/O (RTD) John Dover "Harry" Hare Q79548 AVTECH RNZAF 2 July 1958 until 1 December 1996 on Sunday 18 August 2024 at Blenheim hospice. A celebration of Harry’s life will be held at Springlands chapel Cloudy Bay funeral services at 1pm Saturday 24th August. Feel free to leave messages for Jan and the family below. From Colin Hanson’s By Such Deeds – Honours and awards in the Royal New Zealand Air Force, 1923 – 1999:HARE, Warrant Officer John Dover, (MSM). Q79548; Born Kaikoura, 1 Dec 1941; RNZAF 2 Jul 1958 to 1 Dec 1996; Electrical Fitter. Citation New Zealand Meritorious Service Medal (27 Jan 1994): W/O Hare enlisted in the RNZAF on 2 Jul 1958 in the Ground Communications trade and remustered into the Electrical trade on 6 Jul 1960. During his career he has undertaken a wide range of duties and appointments spread across numerous postings. W/O Hare has served with distinction at Bases Wigram and Woodbourne and currently holds the posting of Technical Adjutant for No 1 Repair Depot. His work history records a pattern of dedication, resolve, loyalty and conscientious professionalism. His organising skills have been acknowledged by the many clubs and associations he has helped to build and support throughout his lengthy career. W/O Hare was the Technical Adjutant at RNZAF Base Wigram prior to his posting to Woodbourne. The position was pivotal to the smooth operation of the technical Sqn. W/O Hare played a major part in the planning and organisation of the technical elements involved in the upheaval that resulted from the movement of flying units to another Base. A careful and co-ordinated approach that entailed long hours liaising with many other services was required to effectively manage the many administrative and domestic issues that were a consequence of Project Relocate. Due to his ability and unfailing efforts, the successful transfer of Wigram technical personnel and equipment to other Bases under Project relocate is directly attributable to W/O Hare’s efforts.
Errol
|
|
|
Post by Dave Homewood on Aug 20, 2024 18:53:11 GMT 12
Very sad. Harry Hare was a great boss when I was on Technical Squadron at Wigram, 1991-1993. Everyone liked him.
|
|
|
Post by trees on Aug 28, 2024 7:58:47 GMT 12
Thomas Francis (Tom) Hodgson NZ444439 RNZAF WW2 NZ Army J Force BCOF Japan as 813646 Passed away peacefully at Hodgson House Rest Home on Friday 23rd August 2024, aged 98 years. Beloved husband of Yvonne for 67 years. Devoted and proud father of Paul, Daniel, Steven, Janine, Julie and Jonathan and father-in-law to Denise, Robyn, Carol and Colin. Loving grandfather to Craig, Matthew, Kylie, Larissa, Teressa, Joel, Chris, Tom, Ben, James, Matt, Will, Sam, Greg and their partners and many precious great grandchildren. A special mention of thanks to the team at Hodgson House for his loving care. A private service will be planned at a later date. All communications to Dan ph 027 279 3996. 15 Revell Drive, Tauranga. "Now in the arms of God."
|
|
|
Post by Dave Homewood on Aug 28, 2024 22:04:30 GMT 12
MORAN, Joseph Thomas. Flight Sergeant RNZAF 71626 - Marine Fitter. Passed peacefully on Saturday evening, 24th August 2024 at Freeling-Holt House, Torbay, in his 96th year. Now finally reunited with his beloved Marge. Joe was a sharp-witted and humorous man with a gentle smile. He was a much loved and respected uncle to his many nieces and nephews, and a friend to many. Rest in peace with Marge, Uncle Joe, and with your siblings: Nora, Celie, Vin, Peggy, Terry, Sheilah and Marie. A private cremation has been held.
|
|
|
Post by Dave Homewood on Aug 29, 2024 21:44:12 GMT 12
|
|
|
Post by Dave Homewood on Sept 7, 2024 8:38:02 GMT 12
Updated - the airman below was apparently a 'Framie' and this not the same Pete Mason who was Safety And Surface, Helicopter Crewman and Air Movements.
MASON, Peter Malcolm (Pete). RNZAF SN: Y82040 Peacefully in Te Puke on Thursday 5th September 2024 aged 77 years. Dearly loved husband of Gael. Much loved dad of Julie and Luke, Leeanne and Bill, and Blair and Catherine. Much loved stepdad of Paul and Wendy, Belinda and Barry, and Christopher. Treasured grandad Pete of all his grandchildren. Sincere thanks are expressed to the staff of Carter House Te Puke, for the wonderful care provided by them to Pete during his stay with them. A service for Pete will be held at the Te Puke Citizens RSA Club, 179 Jellicoe Street Te Puke, on Tuesday 10th September at 1.30pm. Messages to the Mason family C/- PO Box 650 Tauranga 3144
|
|
|
Post by tbf2504 on Sept 7, 2024 13:32:30 GMT 12
What a sad occasion to see of Pete Mason's passing. He was extremely helpful to me as AFPRO advising on various paint schemes and later when I was writing the history of the Orions and 3 Squadron RIP Peter
|
|
|
Post by Dave Homewood on Sept 7, 2024 16:01:50 GMT 12
See the update above Paul.
|
|
|
Post by Dave Homewood on Sept 11, 2024 8:25:48 GMT 12
This has been passed to me this morning.
PASSING OF AN AVIATOR – WARRANT OFFICER (RTD) TANGI KEITH, C78340, ACFT TECH, RNZAF It is with great sadness I advise the passing of Warrant Officer (Rtd) Tangi Keith. Warrant Officer Tangi Keith served in the Royal New Zealand Air Force from 12 April 1956 to 13 February 1981. W/O Keith enlisted in April 1956 as an Engine Assistant at No 1 TTS Hobsonville. After basic engineering and engine mechanic training, he was posted to RNZAF Base Ohakea where he gained experience on Canberra, Dakota, Devon, Harvard and Vampire engines and systems. W/O Keith was posted to Fiji in April 1961, where he maintained Sunderland flyingboat engines. On return to New Zealand, W/O Keith was posted to RNZAF Base Auckland, gaining further experience on Bristol Freighter, Devon, Harvard and Hastings engines. After receiving conversion training on the Sioux helicopter, and promoted to Sergeant in April 1969, W/O Keith undertook training on the Skyhawk aircraft and the Pratt and Whitney J52-P8A power plant in the USA. In May 1976, W/O Keith was posted to Singapore where he gained further experience in the technical management of Bristol Freighter and Iroquois helicopter maintenance. Returning to New Zealand in May 1978, he was posted to No 3 Helicopter Squadron, Hobsonville and promoted to Warrant Officer. From April 1980 to his release in February 1981, W/O Keith was Warrant Officer in charge of Component Maintenance Flight. During his Service career, W/O Keith represented RNZAF in yachting, and Rugby 1962-1963. W/O Keith returned to the RNZAF as a Civilian Aircraft Technician in 1989, employed in CMF Engine Bay for 21 years servicing APU/GTCs, RR Darts and JT8Ds before retiring in 2010. Warrant Officer Keith was awarded the New Zealand Operational Service Medal, The Royal New Zealand Airforce Long Service and Good Conduct Medal with ’1st’ clasp, and the New Zealand Defence Service Medal. A memorial service will be held on Monday 16th September at Morrisons Funerals, 220 Universal Drive, Henderson, Auckland followed by refreshments; all welcome. A livestream link will be available. Messages of condolences can be sent to SGT Angela Keith.
|
|
|
Post by trees on Sept 11, 2024 9:25:39 GMT 12
Peter BLEASE Obituary (Reg. No. 820572, AC1, RNZAF) On September 8, 2024, peacefully in Christchurch, in his 90th year. Loved father and father-in-law of Brenda, John and Leanne, Gary and Sue, and Linda and Graham. Beloved and respected Grandad of Nicole, Jay, Anna, and Sean, and Grandy of Pearl, Ella, Brodie, and Hugo. Many thanks to the staff of Wesley Care for their diligence and compassion to Peter. Messages may be addressed to: The family of the late Peter Blease, c/- PO Box 39001, Christchurch 8545. In accordance with Peter's wishes, a private cremation has been held.
|
|
|
Post by errolmartyn on Sept 11, 2024 11:28:39 GMT 12
This has been passed to me this morning. PASSING OF AN AVIATOR – WARRANT OFFICER (RTD) TANGI KEITH, C78340, ACFT TECH, RNZAF It is with great sadness I advise the passing of Warrant Officer (Rtd) Tangi Keith. Warrant Officer Tangi Keith served in the Royal New Zealand Air Force from 12 April 1956 to 13 February 1981. W/O Keith enlisted in April 1956 as an Engine Assistant at No 1 TTS Hobsonville. After basic engineering and engine mechanic training, he was posted to RNZAF Base Ohakea where he gained experience on Canberra, Dakota, Devon, Harvard and Vampire engines and systems. W/O Keith was posted to Fiji in April 1961, where he maintained Sunderland flyingboat engines. On return to New Zealand, W/O Keith was posted to RNZAF Base Auckland, gaining further experience on Bristol Freighter, Devon, Harvard and Hastings engines. After receiving conversion training on the Sioux helicopter, and promoted to Sergeant in April 1969, W/O Keith undertook training on the Skyhawk aircraft and the Pratt and Whitney J52-P8A power plant in the USA. In May 1976, W/O Keith was posted to Singapore where he gained further experience in the technical management of Bristol Freighter and Iroquois helicopter maintenance. Returning to New Zealand in May 1978, he was posted to No 3 Helicopter Squadron, Hobsonville and promoted to Warrant Officer. From April 1980 to his release in February 1981, W/O Keith was Warrant Officer in charge of Component Maintenance Flight. During his Service career, W/O Keith represented RNZAF in yachting, and Rugby 1962-1963. W/O Keith returned to the RNZAF as a Civilian Aircraft Technician in 1989, employed in CMF Engine Bay for 21 years servicing APU/GTCs, RR Darts and JT8Ds before retiring in 2010. Warrant Officer Keith was awarded the New Zealand Operational Service Medal, The Royal New Zealand Airforce Long Service and Good Conduct Medal with ’1st’ clasp, and the New Zealand Defence Service Medal. memorial service will be held on Monday 16th September at Morrisons Funerals, 220 Universal Drive, Henderson, Auckland followed by refreshments; all welcome. A livestream link will be available. Messages of condolences can be sent to SGT Angela Keith. From Colin Hanson’s By Such Deeds – Honours and awards in the Royal New Zealand Air Force, 1923 – 1999 : Honours, awards and commendations to members of other new zealand services and to civilians who have served the Royal New Zealand Air Force. KEITH, Mr Tangi (C78340). Chief of Air Staff Commendation (1999) - Especially for the design and construction of an advanced air start trolley at RNZAF Base Auckland.Errol
|
|
|
Post by tbf2504 on Sept 11, 2024 15:21:49 GMT 12
Hi Dave, update noted, as you pointed out the original advice was a choice between two with the same names.
|
|